Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Newland Tammy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Newland Terry, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Robert B. Axel presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time225 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Newland, Tammy ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Newland, Tammy ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Newland, Tammy - Granted on 2011-01-11 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Newland, Tammy - Granted on 2011-01-11 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Newland, Tammy - Rejected on 2010-11-12 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Newland, Tammy - Rejected on 2010-11-12 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Norwalk Dept. - Z, Axel, Robert B., Presiding Default Prove Up Trial - Judgment - Default After Prove Up Default Prove Up Trial - Judgment - Default After Prove Up Judge: Axel Robert B. |
|
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Norwalk Dept. - Z, Axel, Robert B., Presiding Default Prove Up Trial - Judgment - Default After Prove Up Judge: Robert B. |
|
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request - Default Setting (Set for 8-13-10 in Dept. Z. - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Newland, Tammy ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.