Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jose Ortega, Angelina Josefa Almendarez, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Robin E Paley, against Ramon Antonio Ramirez, represented by Law Offices David A Gomes, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Kurt J. Lewin presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management189 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2003 |
CategoryPi Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions79 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time455 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
OSC RE: DISMISSAL VACATED |
|
March 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
STAGE AT DISPOSITION: OTHER DISMISSALS AND TRANSFERS Not Applicable |
|
March 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION FILED Not Applicable |
|
March 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
COURT NOW RULES -- STAT CASE FOR 2C REPORT Not Applicable |
|
February 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
OSC RE: MEDIATION/CMC - Minutes Continued KURT J LEWIN PRESIDING. CLERK: LORI FLORES NOT REPORTED COURT ATTENDANT S CHEESMAN ATTORNEY TELEPHONE CONFERENCE WITH ROBIN PALEY PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. - HEARINGS: MATTER SETTLED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 08:30 AT V9 IN DEPARTMENT NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY PLAINTIFF. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: KURT J LEWIN PRESIDING. |
|
February 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
NTC OF STTLMNT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NEED TO USE MANDATORY JUDICIAL COUNCIL FORM CM-200. Not Applicable |
|
November 10, 2004 | Docket Event |
OSC RE: MEDIATION/CMC - Minutes Continued CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/08/05 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT V9. PER STIP & ORDR 10/26/04 Judge: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/08/05 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT V9. |
|
October 26, 2004 | Docket Event |
STIP & ORDR TO CONTINUE MEDIATION COMP DATE SIGNED & FILED. Not Applicable |
|
October 21, 2004 | Docket Event |
FEE PAYMENT Not Applicable |
|
June 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes Continued DAVID A WILLIAMS PRESIDING. CLERK: CARRIE ROBINSON REPORTER: TRACY GRAHAM ATTORNEY ROBIN PALEY (FOR PLAINTIFF) MAKES A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE ATTORNEY WESLEY HELLERUD PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. - PROCEEDINGS: MATTER PROCEED TO MEDIATION. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MEDIATION/CMC SET FOR 08:30 AT V9 IN DEPARTMENT NOTICE WAIVED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: DAVID A WILLIAMS PRESIDING. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.