Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Tulare County. This case was filed in Tulare County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateOctober 23, 2023 |
Last RefreshedApril 13, 2024 |
Filing LocationTulare County, CA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Tentative Ruling: To grant the motion, approve the final class action settlement including fees, costs and service awards, as modified herein. Final Compliance Hearing is set for October 28, 2024, 8:3... | |
November 06, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Tentative Ruling: To grant the motion, as modified below; motion for final approval is set for April 15, 2024, Dept. 2, 8:30 am. | |
October 23, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Tentative Ruling: To continue the motion to November 6, 2023, 8:30 am, Dept. 2 as to lodestar information, presently incurred costs and the notice period; to grant the request for leave to file the pr... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.