Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bear Valley Road Apple Valley, Llc, A California Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Burby, William presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 04, 2006 |
CategoryOther Petition (Not Spec) Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order Filed Re:
Date: May 02, 2013Stipulation Filed re:
Date: April 08, 2013Order Filed Re:
Date: May 02, 2013Motion Re: (Imaged)
Date: February 21, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING STIP FOR DISTRUBUTION OF FUNDS ON DEPOSIT FILED (IMAGED) Order Filed Re: |
|
May 02, 2013 | Hearing |
Order Filed Re: ORDER GRANTING STIP FOR DISTRUBUTION OF FUNDS ON DEPOSIT FILED (IMAGED) |
|
May 02, 2013 | Hearing | Order Filed Re: View Document ORDER GRANTING STIP FOR DISTRUBUTION OF FUNDS ON D Comment ORDER GRANTING STIP FOR DISTRUBUTION OF FUNDS ON DEPOSIT FILED (IMAGED) | |
April 29, 2013 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment MOTION RE: DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS (022113) FILED BY CLAIMANT BEAR VALLEY ROAD APPLE VALLEY,LLC, A | |
April 29, 2013 | Hearing | Motion Re: Original Type Motion Re: Hearing Time 8:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment MOTION RE: DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS (022113) FILED BY CLAIMANT BEAR VALLEY ROAD APPLE VALLEY,LLC, A | |
April 29, 2013 | Hearing |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS (022113) FILED BY CLAIMANT BEAR VALLEY ROAD APPLE VALLEY,LLC, A |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION RE: DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS (022113) FILED BY CLAIMANT BEAR VALLEY ROAD APPLE VALLEY,LLC, A | |
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS (022113) FILED BY CLAIMANT BEAR VALLEY ROAD APPLE VALLEY,LLC, A |
|
April 24, 2013 | Hearing | Comment: Comment FILE SENT TO V9 FOR HRG | |
April 24, 2013 | Hearing | Vacate Hearing Scheduled Comment VACATE L&M HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/29/13 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT V9. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.