Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bleier & Cox, against Johnny Willis, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management189 days |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2003 |
CategoryCollections (Ltd) |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time75 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. Not Applicable |
|
July 23, 2004 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 3299.88 ) Not Applicable |
|
July 23, 2004 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION RE: CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $300.00 FILED. Not Applicable |
|
July 23, 2004 | Docket Event |
COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $24.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $107.57 Not Applicable |
|
June 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
April 01, 2004 | Docket Event |
OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION VACATED |
|
March 08, 2004 | Docket Event |
STIPULATED JUDGMENT FILED. Not Applicable |
|
March 08, 2004 | Docket Event |
FEE PAYMENT Not Applicable |
|
March 01, 2004 | Docket Event |
FILING FEE PAID BY JOHNNY WILLIS FOR DEFENDANT Not Applicable |
|
March 01, 2004 | Docket Event |
FEE PAYMENT Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.