Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Champion Chrysler Jeep Dodge A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Callahan Thompson Sherman & Caudill Llp, against Jimenez Esteban, Jimenez Esteban An Individual, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with Unknown Judicial Officer presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management166 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2017 |
CategoryCollections Case-Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions82 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time204 days |
Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Default Judgment (PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 585(d); )
Date: April 12, 2018Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 12, 2018Notice of Ruling (AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE )
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (AS TO ALL DOE DEFENDANTS ONLY; FROM COMPLAINT; )
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Request to Enter Judgment
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Default Entered (AS TO ESTEBAN JIMENEZ ONLY )
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATON OF PAUL ANTEPARA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; )
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (BY FIRST CLASS MAIL ON )
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Memorandum - Other (DEFICIENCY MEMORANDUM FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND SALES AND LEASES; )
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Default Entered (AS TO ESTEBAN JIMENEZ ONLY )
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (BY FIRST CLASS MAIL ON 02/16/18 )
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Default Judgment (PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 585(d); )
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE )
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF ROBERT W. THOMPSON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; )
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATON OF PAUL ANTEPARA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; )
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (AS TO ALL DOE DEFENDANTS ONLY; FROM COMPLAINT; )
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2018 | Hearing |
in Department F (Order to Show Cause; OSC Discharged) - |
|
April 13, 2018 | Hearing |
in Department F (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) - |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous-Other | |
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment (PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 585(d); ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (CAASE SUMMARY IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT RULE 3.1800(a)(1) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (WITHOUTPREJUDICE; ALL CAUSES OF ACTION AS TO DOE DEFENDANTS ONLY; FROM COMPLAINT; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum - Other (DEFICIENCY MEMORANDUM FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND SALES AND LEASES; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration (DECLARATION OF ROBERT W. THOMPSON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Default Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.