Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
California Top Construction Inc., Fabian Pereyra Individually And Dba, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Crawford & Bangs, Tate Theresa Crawford, against Business Alliance Insurance Company A, Fabian Pereyra Individually And Dba, represented by Marquez Peter, Marquez Peter Manuel, Marquez Peter M. Law Offices Of, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with Margaret Miller Bernal presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management166 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time740 days |
Document:Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: FABIAN PEREYRA, individually and dba (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: CALIFORNIA TOP CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: CALIFORNIA TOP CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: September 25, 2019Document:Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: CALIFORNIA TOP CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Order re: hearing of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Opposition to plaintiff's motion for leave to amend complaint; Filed by:
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CALIFORNIA TOP CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Document:Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: BUSINESS ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, a (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Document:Cross-Compl fld- No Summons Issued Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: December 06, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: September 20, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 01, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: March 07, 2018Motion for Leave - Motion for Leave Motion for Leave to file First Amended Complaint
Date: October 23, 2018Opposition - Opposition to plaintiff's motion for leave to amend complaint
Date: November 16, 2018Amended Complaint - Amended Amended Complaint
Date: November 29, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to file first amended complaint)
Date: November 29, 2018Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 10/05/17 )
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Cross-Compl fld- No Summons Issued
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (BY MAIL )
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 09/29/17 )
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Cross-Compl fld- No Summons Issued
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; )
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Declaration (OF THERESA CRAWFORD )
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to file First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause regarding answer/responsive pleading to t...))
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Leave to file first amended complaint))
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (EX PARTE TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Points & Authorities
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Order (re: hearing of 11/29/18)
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES; )
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Order (on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) Counsel for plaintiff r...))
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial))
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Order (GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; )
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF THERESA CRAWFORD TATE)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: September 25, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: September 30, 2019Stipulation and Order (For Dismissal under CCP 664.6)
Date: September 24, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.