Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Shuster Patsy, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Coronado Edgar I. Law Offices Of, against Reyes George George Reyes Jr, Reyes George Jr, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with Brian F. Gasdia presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management154 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2017 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions133 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time291 days |
Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Document:Abstract of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Document:Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Document:Request for Correction Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Document:Declaration of Diligence Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Default entered as to GEORGE REYES; On the Complaint filed by PATSY SHUSTER on
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: PATSY SHUSTER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Document:Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Summons Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by PATSY SHUSTER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by PATSY SHUSTER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by PATSY SHUSTER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Assignment of Judgment Filed by Coachella Valley Collections Service (Assignee)
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by PATSY SHUSTER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by PATSY SHUSTER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Writ - Return Filed by PATSY SHUSTER (Plaintiff)
Date: October 05, 2021Minute order entered: 2017-11-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence Filed by PATSY SHUSTER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Request for Correction Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)) Filed by Coachella Valley Collections Service (Assignee)
Date: October 01, 2019Writ of Execution ((LOS ANGELES)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Riverside)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by PATSY SHUSTER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-31 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-14 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-30 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-03 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Request for Correction
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: September 10, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-31 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Assignment of Judgment
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Riverside))
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((LOS ANGELES))
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: October 01, 2019Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.