Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
American Express Bank Fsb A Federal, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael & Associates Pc, against Lee Lidia, Lee Lydia Jeong, World Travel Agency Inc. A California, represented by Sung William Y., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with Robert J. Higa presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 24, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions67 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment By Court |
Case Cycle Time722 days |
Declaration
Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-08-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-12-07T00:00:00Writ filed
Date: August 13, 2018Notice
Date: 2016-12-29T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2015-10-30T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2015-09-17T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-12-09T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-12-03T00:00:00Order
Date: June 27, 2017Application
Date: 2015-09-16T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-08-24T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2015-08-24T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-11-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2016-03-11T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2015-12-16T00:00:00Writ issued
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2016-03-11T00:00:00Notice
Date: August 07, 2017Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-12-29T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: August 18, 2017Writ issued
Date: September 08, 2017Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: September 08, 2017Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.