Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lba Realty Fund Iii- Company Ix Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Fitzgerald Yap Kreditor Llp, against Stamati Michel Dba Zooop It Up, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with Unknown Judicial Officer presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management128 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryUd/Commercial (Not Drugs/Evict) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions87 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time87 days |
Request for Correction Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2015-03-27T00:00:00Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment ($36,825.13 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2015-04-17T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Request for Correction Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-02-17T00:00:00Stipulation (STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2015-03-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by LBA REALTY FUND III- COMPANY IX, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-11-09T00:00:00Cost Bill After Judgment Filed by LBA REALTY FUND III- COMPANY IX, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: February 22, 2016Request for Dismissal Filed by LBA REALTY FUND III- COMPANY IX, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-03-27T00:00:00Writ issued Filed by LBA REALTY FUND III- COMPANY IX, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: February 22, 2016Writ filed (RETURNED FROM ORANGE COUNTY, CA ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: September 06, 2016Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by LBA REALTY FUND III- COMPANY IX, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-04-17T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2015-03-27T00:00:00Writ issued (ORANGE COUNTY $40,159.56 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: February 22, 2016Request for Correction (ABSTRACT REJ; AMOUNT OF JUDGMENT ON ITEM #6 IS INCORRECT AMOUNT ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00Request for Correction Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-02-04T00:00:00Writ issued Filed by LBA REALTY FUND III- COMPANY IX, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00Request for Correction Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-04-03T00:00:00Writ issued (LOS ANGELES $36,860.13 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by LBA REALTY FUND III- COMPANY IX, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-01-14T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Summons Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Cost Bill After Judgment (DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST $3,299.43 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE; COMPLAINT AS TO DOES 1 TO 20 ONLY; )
Date: 2015-03-27T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Request for Correction
Date: 2015-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2015-01-14T00:00:00Request for Correction
Date: 2015-02-04T00:00:00Request for Correction (NEED FIRST APP. FEE; NEED DISM. OF DOES IF ANY ON THE COMPLAINT; )
Date: 2015-02-17T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (MICHEL STAMATI DBA ZOOOP IT UP SERVED ON 1-2-15 )
Date: 2015-01-14T00:00:00Writ issued (ORANGE COUNTY $40,159.56 )
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2015-03-27T00:00:00Writ issued
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Cost Bill After Judgment (DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST $3,299.43 )
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2015-03-27T00:00:00Request for Correction
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2015-04-17T00:00:00Writ filed (RETURNED FROM ORANGE COUNTY, CA )
Date: September 06, 2016Miscellaneous-Other (RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION LOS ANGELES COUNTY WRIT ISSUED ON: 04-10-15 )
Date: 2015-11-09T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Stipulation (STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) )
Date: 2015-03-27T00:00:00Request for Correction
Date: 2015-04-03T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: June 09, 2016Request for Dismissal
Date: 2015-03-27T00:00:00Writ issued (LOS ANGELES $36,860.13 )
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00Request for Correction (ABSTRACT REJ; AMOUNT OF JUDGMENT ON ITEM #6 IS INCORRECT AMOUNT )
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00Writ issued
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment ($36,825.13 )
Date: 2015-04-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-11-09T00:00:00Cost Bill After Judgment
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment (FULL MICHEL STAMATI dba ZOOOP IT UP )
Date: June 09, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.