Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Swedo Linda, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Brown Allen K., against Lowe'S Companies Inc., Lowe'S Hiw Inc., represented by Tharpe & Howell, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Rafael A. Ongkeko presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management136 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2011 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time623 days |
Complaint
Date: 2011-09-16T00:00:00Order
Date: 2011-11-28T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2011-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2011-09-16T00:00:00Motion to Strike (PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; )
Date: 2011-10-27T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2011-09-16T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2011-09-16T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2011-10-27T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION TO STRIKE )
Date: 2011-11-10T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT )
Date: 2011-11-17T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2011-11-17T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2012-01-13T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed
Date: 2011-11-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2012-03-08T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2012-01-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2012-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2011-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2011-11-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2011-11-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2012-02-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2012-01-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2012-02-16T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2012-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court (TO ADVERSE PARTY AND SUPERIOR CT. OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT )
Date: 2012-03-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2012-07-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2012-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2012-06-27T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2012-06-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2012-09-17T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2012-08-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIP AND ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT )
Date: 2012-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2012-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2012-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2012-03-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2012-08-01T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONF )
Date: 2012-07-09T00:00:00Statement-Non-Agreement (FIRST SANA FILED. MEDIATION ENDED IN NON-AGREEMENT. )
Date: 2013-01-15T00:00:00Order
Date: 2012-10-23T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2013-02-21T00:00:00Opposition (DECLARATION OF STEVE HERNANDEZ )
Date: 2013-02-21T00:00:00Opposition (MEMO OF P & A'S IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MSJ )
Date: 2013-02-21T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDIS- PUTED MATERIAL FACTS )
Date: 2013-03-01T00:00:00Opposition (UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS )
Date: 2013-02-21T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2012-10-17T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (DECLARATION OF DIANA M. RIVERA REM MSJ )
Date: 2013-03-01T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (TO MSJ )
Date: 2013-03-01T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (DECLARATION OF AGUSTIN GUERRERO IN SUPPORT OF MSJ )
Date: 2013-03-01T00:00:00Notice (OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE- REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR MSC )
Date: 2013-02-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2013-02-26T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2012-10-10T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2012-12-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2012-12-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2012-10-24T00:00:00Declaration (OF PHAEDRA POLYCHRONIS IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MSJ )
Date: 2013-03-01T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2012-12-21T00:00:00Statement-Non-Agreement
Date: 2013-01-15T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2013-03-01T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANT'S UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS )
Date: 2013-02-21T00:00:00Opposition (SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL )
Date: 2012-10-10T00:00:00Notice-Assignment-Mediator
Date: 2012-10-31T00:00:00Notice-Assignment-Mediator
Date: 2012-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2012-10-24T00:00:00Opposition (DECLARATION OF LINDA SWEDO )
Date: 2013-02-21T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS RE MSJ )
Date: 2013-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed (RE REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MSJ )
Date: 2013-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2013-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord
Date: 2013-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2013-03-18T00:00:00Notice-Settlement (OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY L/O OF STEVE HERNANDEZ )
Date: 2013-03-18T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2013-03-06T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE TRANSFER AND OSC RE: DISMISSAL )
Date: May 27, 2013Objection Document Filed (PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE. )
Date: 2013-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2013-03-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2013-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE OSC HEARING )
Date: May 08, 2013Notice of Ruling (RE MSJ OF DEFENDANT LOWE'S HIW, INC.; DENIED; HEARD MARCH 7, 2013 )
Date: 2013-03-14T00:00:00Order
Date: 2013-03-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: May 31, 2013Objection Document Filed
Date: 2013-03-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: May 27, 2013Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord
Date: 2013-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: May 08, 2013Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
Date: 2013-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2013-03-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.