Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ramos Guillermo, Ramos Ruben, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Simon & Simon Llp, against Caudillo Carilu, Century 21 Allstars Inc., Fidelity Title Insurance Company, Maxres Inc. A California Corp., Saucedo Venny, (total of 10) See All represented by Ericksen Arbuthnot, Nelson Jeffrey S. National Law Group, Skebba & Isaac Law Offices Of, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with David J presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management132 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2011 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions68 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time1040 days |
Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2011-09-16T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2011-09-16T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2011-09-16T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2011-09-30T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2011-09-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2011-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer
Date: 2011-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer
Date: 2011-10-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2011-11-04T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed
Date: 2011-11-04T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2011-09-30T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO EDWARD SURCHIK )
Date: 2011-11-07T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2011-11-08T00:00:00Order (SUSTAINING DEMURRER OF 11/23/11 )
Date: 2011-11-23T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEMURRER; )
Date: 2011-11-08T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2011-11-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2011-11-23T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (TO FIDELITY NAT. TITLE INSURANCE CO. DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT )
Date: 2011-11-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2011-11-23T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER )
Date: 2011-11-23T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed
Date: 2011-12-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2011-12-07T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2011-12-07T00:00:00Cross-complaint filed (NO SUMMONS ISSUED )
Date: 2011-12-07T00:00:00Amended Answer to Complaint
Date: 2011-12-08T00:00:00Summons Issued (RE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2011-12-09T00:00:00Amended Answer to Complaint
Date: 2011-12-08T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2012-01-09T00:00:00First Amended Complaint (SUMMONS ISSUED )
Date: 2011-12-09T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2011-12-09T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2011-12-09T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2012-01-12T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2012-01-12T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2012-01-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2012-01-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2012-01-12T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2012-01-12T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2012-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2012-01-23T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2012-01-17T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2012-02-02T00:00:00First Amended Cross-Complaint (SUMMONS ISSUED )
Date: 2012-02-02T00:00:00Summons Filed (ON CROSS COMPLAINT )
Date: 2012-02-02T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2012-02-02T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2012-02-02T00:00:00First Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2012-02-02T00:00:00Answer to Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2012-02-27T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2012-02-27T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2012-02-27T00:00:00Cross-complaint filed
Date: 2012-02-27T00:00:00Answer to Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2012-02-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2012-02-27T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (OF SUMMONS AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO EDWARD SURCHIK )
Date: 2012-03-02T00:00:00Answer to First Amended X-Compl
Date: 2012-03-09T00:00:00Answer to First Amended X-Compl
Date: 2012-03-09T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2012-03-16T00:00:00Cross-complaint filed (NO SUMMONS ISSUED (DISMISSED IN MINUTE ORDER OF 3/5/13) )
Date: 2012-03-16T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2012-03-16T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2012-03-16T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2012-03-23T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2012-03-23T00:00:00Answer to First Amended X-Compl
Date: 2012-04-25T00:00:00Answer to First Amended X-Compl
Date: 2012-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2012-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2012-09-10T00:00:00Notice (JURY FEES )
Date: 2012-10-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2012-10-10T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2013-03-05T00:00:00Order of Dismissal (DISMISSING CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 3/16/12 IN MINUTE ORDER OF 3/5/13; )
Date: 2013-03-05T00:00:00Order
Date: 2013-03-08T00:00:00Application
Date: 2013-03-08T00:00:00Order (DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT )
Date: 2013-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2013-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2013-03-18T00:00:00Application - Misc (APPLICATION FOR ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT )
Date: 2013-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2013-03-18T00:00:00Notice-Settlement
Date: 2013-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2013-06-04T00:00:00Stipulation (JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES RE: CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL )
Date: 2013-05-28T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2013-05-28T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE & STIPULATION )
Date: 2013-05-28T00:00:00Order
Date: 2013-03-27T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2013-03-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIP AND ORDER RE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT )
Date: 2013-05-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2013-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal,& P&S
Date: 2013-06-03T00:00:00Order (RE STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE GRANTED )
Date: 2013-05-28T00:00:00Order (GRANTED ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATES )
Date: 2013-03-27T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2013-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal,& P&S
Date: 2013-06-03T00:00:00Order
Date: 2013-05-28T00:00:00Ord of Disml for Settled Case
Date: July 22, 2014Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2013-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: May 22, 2014Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE; FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED 12/9/11 )
Date: June 30, 2014Notice of Change of Address
Date: 2014-05-22T00:00:00Request for Correction
Date: 2014-05-22T00:00:00Notice-Settlement (OF ENTIRE CASE )
Date: 2013-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2013-07-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: June 30, 2014Request for Correction
Date: June 10, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.