Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Daniels Lauretta, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Fuchs S. Law Offices Of, against Dollar Tree Stores Inc., represented by Clinton & Clinton, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with RAUL A. SAHAGUN presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management128 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 10, 2010 |
CategoryPremises Liability (E.G.Slip & Fall) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time331 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding Order to Show Cause (RE DISMISSALPER M/O 01-14-11) - OSC Discharged Judge: Master Calendar |
|
March 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department F (Order to Show Cause; OSC Discharged) - |
|
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department F Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION W PREJ ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner |
|
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by LAURETTA DANIELS (Plaintiff) |
|
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department F Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department F Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) (Mandatory Settlement Conference; Settled) - |
|
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice-Settlement (OF ENTIRE CASE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by LAURETTA DANIELS (Plaintiff) |
|
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department F, Raul A. Sahagun, Presiding Conference-Case Management - Trial and MSC Set Judge: Raul A. Sahagun |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.