Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Best Service Co. The, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Law Offices Of James T. Reed Jr, Miele Kenneth J., against Okamoto Akiko, Okamoto Bonnie, Okamoto Mike, Okamoto Mitsumasa, Okamoto Mitsumasa Dba Supreme Auto Leasing, (total of 6) See All represented by Remer Divincezno & Griffith Esq, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with Margaret Miller Bernal presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 07, 2000 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions315 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment By Court |
Case Cycle Time830 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Western Loans, LLC (Assignee); As to: Akiko Okamoto (Defendant); Mitsumasa Okamoto (Defendant) | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by Western Loans, LLC (Assignee) Filed by Western Loans, LLC (Assignee) |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ - Return ( Partially Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 25.00; Interest Credits: 30,790.17; Principal Credits: 159,586.31; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Partially Satisfied | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ - Return | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Assignment of Judgment Filed by Western Loans, LLC (Assignee) Filed by Western Loans, LLC (Assignee) |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Assignment of Judgment; Filed by: Western Loans, LLC (Assignee); As to: WV SPE 2018-3A (Assignee) | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Certificate of Clerk - Judgment Creditor's Costs Added to Judgment: As To Parties: removed | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Clerk - Judgment Creditor's Costs Added to Judgment; Filed by: WV SPE 2018-3A (Assignee) | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate (of Clerk - Judgment Creditor's Costs Added to Judgment) Filed by WV SPE 2018-3A (Assignee) Filed by WV SPE 2018-3A (Assignee) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.