Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Narvaez, Francisco Javier, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts with Jay K. Weatherby presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJay K. Weatherby Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 06, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Cases Relating To Criminal Matters |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Remove Intoxilizer Motion Motion to Remove Intoxilizer |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Order FOR REMOVAL OF BREATHALIZER FOR REMOVAL OF BREATHALIZER |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Weatherby, Jay) | |
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing | |
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Continuance Granted CANCELED Motion Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Weatherby, Jay) Continuance Granted Motion for Occupational License |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance | |
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for Continuance | |
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
PENDING PROPOSED ORDERS OSH-unsigned OSH-unsigned |
|
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Appearance FOR APPLICANT FOR APPLICANT |
|
March 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.