Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ohara, Alyse Kay, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ohara, Patrick Michael, in the jurisdiction of Tom Green County, TX, . Tom Green County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 13, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTom Green County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL DECREE - AGREED (OCA) | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judicial Docket Entries Hearing, GBW/LD Remote video/Audio conference, pursuant to the emergency orders of the Texas Supreme Court and Court of Criminal Appeals. Final Hearing. Pet here pro se; Resp here pro se. Heard evidence. Find there no ch. Grant divorce. Approve the agreement for the division of the property and the debts. No name change requested. Signed decree. Hearing, GBW/LD Remote video/Audio conference, pursuant to the emergency orders of the Texas Supreme Court and Court of Criminal Appeals. Final Hearing. Pet here pro se; Resp here pro se. Heard evidence. Find there no ch. Grant divorce. Approve the agreement for the division of the property and the debts. No name change requested. Signed decree. |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Divorce (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Woodward, Ben) | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Order Regarding Audio/Video Remote Hearings - Pro Se Divorce Order Regarding Audio/Video Remote Hearings - Pro Se Divorce |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Information Sheet | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter to the Clerk Letter Letter to the Clerk |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL ORDER (Judicial Officer: Woodward, Ben ) Self-Represented Litigants Self-Represented Litigants |
|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR HEARING Sent to Que 3-20-20 Sent to Que 3-20-20 |
|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | WAIVER | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.