Case Last Refreshed: 12 hours ago
Marisell Fournier, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Xxxxxx Y. Xxxxxxxxx, represented by Tiffany A Yates Mcwhorter, in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts Tarrant Count - District Clerk with Christopher R. Wolfe presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher R. Wolfe Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 30, 2020 |
CategoryFamily |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseTarrant Count - District Clerk |
This complaint is an original petition for divorce filed by Marisell Fournier against xxxxxx Y. xxxxxxxxx. The document states that the parties have been informally married since establishing their prior residence in New York and have maintained thei...
ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIV
Date: October 30, 2020Citation-ISSUED ON xxxxxx Y. xxxxxxxxx-On 10/30/2020
Date: October 30, 2020(PROP) NO ACCESS TRO & ORD SET HRG FOR TEMP ORDS
Date: October 30, 2020NO ACCESS TEMP RESTRAIN ORD & 12/04/2020 @ 9 AM ORDER SETTING HRG FOR TEMP ORDERS
Date: October 30, 2020(PROP) TEMP EX PARTE P.O. & ORD SET HRG (E-LY)
Date: October 30, 2020CITATION, Prot Order-ISSUED ON-On 10/30/2020
Date: October 30, 2020TEMP EX PARTE PRO ORD & ORD SET 12/04/2020 @ 9 AM HRG
Date: October 30, 2020AN APPLICATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: October 30, 2020T.R.O. PROTECTIVE ORDER-ISSUED ON xxxxxx Y. xxxxxxxxx. H/R 12/04/2020 - 09:00-On 10/30/2020
Date: October 30, 2020T.R.O.-ISSUED ON xxxxxx Y. xxxxxxxxx. H/R 12/04/2020 - 09:00-On 10/30/2020
Date: October 30, 2020ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - ATTY MIEARS
Date: April 05, 2021(PROPOSED) NOT OF HRG FOR TEMP ORDS (E-LY)
Date: April 15, 2021(PROPOSED) AGREED ORD GRANTING MOT FOR W/D OF COUN
Date: March 03, 2021(PROP) NOT OF HRG ON RESP'S MOT FOR TEMP ORDS (E-
Date: January 19, 2021MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: April 05, 2021(PROPOSED) NOT OF HRG ON MOT FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: April 05, 2021SUPPLEMENTAL PET FOR DIVORCE
Date: March 24, 2022MOTION FOR W/D OF COUNSEL
Date: March 01, 2021LETTER FROM ATTY SWAN TO COURT RE:ORD FOR W/D
Date: March 03, 2021MOTION FOR W/D OF COUNSEL - SHERYL MIEARS
Date: February 18, 2022RESP'S NOT OF COMPLETION OF CO-PARENT ORIENTATION
Date: September 23, 2021RULE 11 AGREEMENT - ACCESS TO RESIDENCE (E-LY)
Date: April 09, 2021AMEND COUNTERPET TO MOD PCR
Date: March 23, 2022(PROPOSED) NOT OF RESET HRG ON MOT FOR JUDGE TO
Date: April 15, 2021INCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT (CC: C/S)
Date: March 08, 2022APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL - CHRISTOPHER HEISE
Date: March 22, 2022ORD FOR "PARENTING WITHOUT CONFLICT" AND CO-PARENT
Date: September 15, 2021NOH RESP'S MTN PRE-TRIAL CNF/STATUS CNF-7/13/21
Date: June 21, 2021NOT OF HRG -4/6/21 @ 230P/ZOOM/ON RESP'S MOT FOR
Date: March 05, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING 1/22/21 @ 9 AM - ZOOM
Date: January 20, 2021NOT OF RESET HRG ON MOT FOR 5/10/21 @ 2PM - ZOOM
Date: April 15, 2021PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER - 5/25/22 @9AM
Date: September 30, 2021NO ACCESS TEMP RESTRAIN ORD & 12/04/2020 @ 9 AM
Date: October 30, 2020Citation Tr# 3 RET EXEC(xxxxxx Y. xxxxxxxxx) On 11
Date: November 17, 2020(PROPOSED) ORD GRANTING MOT TO EXTEND TEMP EXPARTE
Date: January 05, 2021MOTION TO EXTEND TEMP EXPARTE PROT ORD AND NO
Date: January 05, 2021AGREED MUTUAL INJUNCTIONS
Date: January 07, 2021MOT FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2020Citation-ISSUED ON xxxxxx Y. xxxxxxxxx-On
Date: October 30, 2020AGREED ORDER IN SMPCR
Date: August 10, 2022RESP'S VERIFIED ORIGINAL ANSWER AND MOT TO STRIKE
Date: November 30, 2020(PROPOSED) AGREED MUTUAL INJUNCTIONS (E-LY)
Date: January 06, 2021TEMP EX PARTE PRO ORD & ORD SET 12/04/2020 @ 9 AM
Date: October 30, 2020(PROP) NOT OF HRG (E-LY)
Date: January 19, 2021T.R.O. PROTECTIVE ORDER-ISSUED ON xxxxxx Y.
Date: October 30, 2020ORD ON MOT FOR ALT SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2020CONFIRMATION LETTER - 1/22/21 @ 9A (E-LY)
Date: December 14, 2020RESP'S MOT FOR TEMP ORDS
Date: January 19, 2021AGREED ORD GRANTING MOT FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL
Date: March 04, 2021MOTION FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT
Date: November 30, 2020T.R.O.-ISSUED ON xxxxxx Y. xxxxxxxxx. H/R
Date: October 30, 2020T.R.O. PROTECTIVE ORDER Tr# 17 RET EXEC(xxxxxx Y.
Date: November 17, 2020ORD ON MOT FOR ALT SERVICE (DUPLICATE)
Date: November 12, 2020NOTICE OF FILING ADDITIONAL BUSINESS RECORDS
Date: January 07, 2021MOT FOR JUDGE TO CONFER WITH CHILD
Date: January 19, 2021NOTICE OF FILING BUSINESS RECORDS AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 06, 2021CITATION, Prot Order Tr# 16 RET EXEC(xxxxxx Y. RAM
Date: November 17, 2020T.R.O. Tr# 9 RET EXEC(xxxxxx Y. xxxxxxxxx) On 11/1
Date: November 17, 2020(PROP) ORD ON MOT FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2020NOTICE OF BUSINESS RECORDS DECLARATION
Date: May 04, 2021NOT OF FILING CERT OF ATTENDANCE
Date: September 24, 2021SUBPOENA AND ORD COMPELLING THE PRODUCTION OF
Date: September 17, 2021NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WOP ON 10/20/2022 Image ID 632
Date: August 05, 2022ORD ON MOT FOR W/D OF COUNSEL - SHERYL ANN MIEARS
Date: March 02, 2022RESP'S MOT FOR STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: June 16, 2021PTNR'S NTC OF FILING CERT OF COMPLETIONS
Date: November 16, 2021SUBPOENA/ORD COMPEL THE PROD OF RECS FOR SOPHIE
Date: September 30, 2021AJ'S RENDITION
Date: September 15, 2021NOT OF CHANGE OF EMPLOYMENT
Date: February 17, 202210 DAY LETTER (E-AW)
Date: February 18, 2022PTNR'S NOT OF FILING CERT OF COMPLETIONS
Date: November 01, 2021PRE-TRIAL CONF ORD - 5/25/22 @9AM
Date: September 17, 2021CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION - xxxxxx xxxxxxxxx
Date: October 27, 2021RESP'S MOT FOR PRETRIAL CONF
Date: June 16, 2021TEMPORARY ORDERS
Date: November 10, 2021AMEND MOT FOR DECLATORY JDGMT
Date: March 23, 2022NOT OF HRG ON RESP'S MOT FOR 5/10/21 @ 2 PM - ZOOM
Date: April 13, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF EMPLOYMENT - xxxxxx xxxxxxxxx
Date: July 12, 2021CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE - MARISELL FOURNIER
Date: November 17, 2021MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (E-AW)
Date: April 01, 2022IV-D INTERVENTION
Date: August 27, 2021COUNTERPET TO MOD PCR
Date: March 23, 2022ORDER APPOINTING REUNIFICATION COUNSELOR
Date: September 17, 2021RESP'S NOT OF COMPLETION OF CHILDREN IN THE MIDDLE
Date: October 26, 2021RESP'S NOT OF COMPLETION - PARENTING WITHOUT
Date: October 26, 2021MARISELL FOURNIER'S ANSWER TO AMEND MOT FOR
Date: March 24, 2022NOT OF HRG FOR TEMP ORD 5/10/21 @ 2 PM - ZOOM
Date: April 15, 2021PTNR'S CERT OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY DIRECT TO RESP
Date: March 25, 2022CONFIRMATION LETTER - 9/15/21 @9:30AM (E-AW)
Date: August 10, 2021EMAIL FROM COORDINATOR RE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Date: October 01, 2021Costbill (Short) for $350 TIFFANY A YATES MCWHORTE
Date: March 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER IN SMPCR | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Adjustment for # 19 citation never issued | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WOP ON 10/20/2022 Image ID 632 | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DWOP DOCKET EMAILED/NOT SENT CLOSED 8/10 | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | No Fee Documents | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (E-AW) | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Costbill (Short) for $350 TIFFANY A YATES MCWHORTE | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | FEE INCUR FOR MOT FOR DECLATORY JDMGT FILED 11/30/ | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | No Fee Documents |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.