Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ovation Services, Llc, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Hemphill, William R., Jr., against Smith, Rex, Smith, Evelyn, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 382nd District Court with Hall, Brett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHall, Brett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 04, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Filing Court House382nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of NonSuit | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Process Return | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | No Fee Document | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.