Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Gambrill, Louisa, against Voya Insurance Solutions, Inc., A Connecticut Corporation, Metroplex Acquisition Fund, Lp, A Texas Limited Partnership, represented by Doggett, Scott T., in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 382nd District Court with Hall, Brett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHall, Brett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Eminent Domain |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Filing Court House382nd District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Check | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Return | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Return | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Other | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Award Of Special Commissioners | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Check | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.