Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bell , Kaitlyn Mary, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bell , Kyle Randall, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2023 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Trial Before the Court | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Vacate | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Deputy Reporter Statement | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Vacation Notice | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Vacate Judgment | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | No Fee Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.