Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Carner, Stephanie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Carner, Chauncey Don, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Ana E. Estevez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAna E. Estevez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2022 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Divorce (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 1-24-22 @1:30 PM VIA ZOOM 1-24-22 @1:30 PM VIA ZOOM |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Divorce (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 10-27-21 @1:30PM VIA ZOOM 10-27-21 @1:30PM VIA ZOOM |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER NOTICE OF HEARING - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ NOTICE OF HEARING - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER - FILED BY ATTORNEY JANIS ALEXANDER CROSS RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER - FILED BY ATTORNEY JANIS ALEXANDER CROSS |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
COUNTER PETITION ORIGINAL COUNTERPETITION FOR DIVORCE ORIGINAL COUNTERPETITION FOR DIVORCE |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Estevez, Ana) | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry Barbara Younger, C.S.R. , Petitioner and attorney Vaavia Edwards appeared via zoom. Respondent appeared pro se. Respondent said he hired an attorney and requested a continuance. Petitioner did not object. Continuance granted. Barbara Younger, C.S.R. , Petitioner and attorney Vaavia Edwards appeared via zoom. Respondent appeared pro se. Respondent said he hired an attorney and requested a continuance. Petitioner did not object. Continuance granted. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.