Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rea, Chellsea Ann Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rea, Emmett Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts with Titiana D. Frausto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTitiana D. Frausto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2022 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Frausto, Titiana) | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Frausto, Titiana) | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
EMPLOYER LETTER W/W MAILED 4-9-21 TO VIVINT IN 4931 N 300 WEST, PROVO UT MAILED 4-9-21 TO VIVINT IN 4931 N 300 WEST, PROVO UT |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF INCOME WITHHOLDING | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT FROM SDU FROM SDU |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY ORDERS 19 PGS - SIGNED ON 4/7/2021 - SENT TO SDU 19 PGS - SIGNED ON 4/7/2021 - SENT TO SDU |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED INCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED INCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST ISSUANCE OF WAGE ASSIGNMENT (PAID) (PAID) |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED AGREED TEMPORARY ORDERS - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED AGREED TEMPORARY ORDERS - SENT TO JUDGE FRAUSTO |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry Parties appeared via Zoom with their attorneys and announced agreement on the record. The parties will be named temporary JMC with P having the right to establish the primary residence of the child; R shall have supervised visitation from 10am - 4pm every other Sunday beginning 3/28 and telephone access on Mon and Th from 7pm - 8pm. R shall have a OSAR scree with Linda Dudley and sign a release for counseling records. R shall pay CS of $620.34 begin 4/1 and provide medical and dental coverage for the child; mutual standard temp injunctions; Show Cause scheduled for 4/30 at 9am. Atty for Pet to prepare the order; Parties appeared via Zoom with their attorneys and announced agreement on the record. The parties will be named temporary JMC with P having the right to establish the primary residence of the child; R shall have supervised visitation from 10am - 4pm every other Sunday beginning 3/28 and telephone access on Mon and Th from 7pm - 8pm. R shall have a OSAR scree with Linda Dudley and sign a release for counseling records. R shall pay CS of $620.34 begin 4/1 and provide medical and dental coverage for the child; mutual standard temp injunctions; Show Cause scheduled for 4/30 at 9am. Atty for Pet to prepare the order; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.