Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
On Deck Capital, Inc, filed a(n) Promissory Note - Creditor case represented by Jacob M Figelman, against Hodges, Kelly, Jtk Baileys Shed , Llc, in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2020 |
CategoryAccounts, Notes, And Contracts |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
Matter TypePromissory Note |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE 1 PAGE SIGNED ON 1-4-2021 1 PAGE SIGNED ON 1-4-2021 |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ PROPOSED ORDER - E-FILED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE - SENT TO JUDGE ESTEVEZ |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION UNSERVED JTK BAILEYS SHED LLC - VACANT PROPERTY JTK BAILEYS SHED LLC - VACANT PROPERTY |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED KELLY HODGES - EFILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE KELLY HODGES - EFILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED JTK BAILEYS SHED, LLC - EFILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE JTK BAILEYS SHED, LLC - EFILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED PETITION PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED PETITION |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE | |
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION UNSERVED JTK BAILEYS SHED, LLC JTK BAILEYS SHED, LLC |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED EFILED TO javitchcourts@abclegal.com EFILED TO javitchcourts@abclegal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.