Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Revell, Cathy, filed a(n) Product Liability - Other case represented by Ryan Browne, against Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Astora Women S Health, Llc, Astora Women S Health Holdings, Llc, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Randall County, TX, . Randall County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2020 |
CategoryProduct Liability - Other |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRandall County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS 10/12/20 ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS 10/12/20 |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS HOLDINGS 10/12/20 AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS HOLDINGS 10/12/20 |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS 10/12/20 AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS 10/12/20 |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS 10/20/20 AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS 10/20/20 |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED ASTORA WOMEN'S HEALTH HOLDINGS 10/12/20 ASTORA WOMEN'S HEALTH HOLDINGS 10/12/20 |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF REMOVAL TOTHE UNITED STATES FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS OF REMOVAL TOTHE UNITED STATES FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION SERVED AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC 9/18/20 AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC 9/18/20 |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEM, INC AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEM, INC |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, LLC AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.