Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Robert M. Galvan, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M. Galvan, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Galvan, Bobby) PROTECTIVE ORDER PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Application for Protective Order (Notice) Gottfredson, Jory Remington Served 03/30/2021 Returned 04/01/2021 | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Galvan, Bobby ) TEMP EX PARTE PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER SETTING HEARING TEMP EX PARTE PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER SETTING HEARING |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Galvan, Bobby ) Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order And Order Setting Hearing Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order And Order Setting Hearing |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application for a Protective Order Application Application for a Protective Order |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Identifier Identifier |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Respondent Notice Notice Of Respondent |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Texas Crime Information Center TCIC TCIC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.