Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mcmichael, Kyleigh Miranda, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mcmichael, Trenten Eugene, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Jennifer J. Robin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJennifer J. Robin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Docket Control Order
Date: June 07, 2021Original Answer
Date: April 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.)
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Submission (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robin, Jennifer J.)
Judge: Robin, Jennifer J. |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Parenting Certificate | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Docket Control Order |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Respondent's Original Answer Original Answer |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.