Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lee, Quasakay Ajune, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lee, Lachristopher Nakia, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, TX, . Montgomery County, TX Superior Courts with Charles T. Moreland presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles T. Moreland Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Modify Temporary Orders (non-OCA) | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Order in Suit Affecting the Parent-Child Relationship Signed Order |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | E-Notice Envelope Number: | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Moreland, Charles T)
Judge: Moreland, Charles T |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationLee, LaChristopher Nakia, Jr.Served05/07/2021Returned05/10/2021 | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Request For Service | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter - Request for Service on Non-Custodial Parent Letters |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Signed Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders set for 07/06/2021 at 1:30 P.M. Signed Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.