Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bosworth, William C, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBosworth, William C, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeAll Other Dispositions |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Scan Box ***** Scan Box 3665***** ***** Scan Box 3665***** Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Adult Name Change (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Held
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Changing the Name of an Adult
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Requesting Hearing -Put in Court Box -Put in Court Box Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certification of Criminal History Record Information
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Petition to Change the Name of an Adult Petition to Change the Name of an Adult Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.