Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Trevino, April Elizabeth, Zamora, Jose Elias, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Marci K. Liggett, against Allstate Vehicle And Property Insurance Company, represented by Rebecca Jean Davis, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with LETTY LOPEZ presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLETTY LOPEZ Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Order Of Dismissal |
Agreed Order, Signed
Date: October 04, 2021Motion to Dismiss, Filed
Date: October 01, 2021Defendant's Original Answer
Date: April 22, 2021Original Petition (OCA)
Date: March 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Tickler (6:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Lopez, Letty) | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Returned Unserved NOTICE OF 306 NOTICE OF 306 Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tickler (6:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Lopez, Letty) CHECK DISP 10/29/2021 Reset by Court to 10/12/2021 CHECK DISP Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DISNIISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DISNIISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order, Signed AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DISNIISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DISNIISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DISNIISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DISNIISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order, Signed GRANTING MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE SIGNED BY JUDGE LETTY LOPEZ. CLERK TO ISSUE.CD GRANTING MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE SIGNED BY JUDGE LETTY LOPEZ. CLERK TO ISSUE.CD Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss, Filed
Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DISNIISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DISNIISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification of Deposition OF JOSE ELIAS ZAMORA OF JOSE ELIAS ZAMORA Judge: Lopez, Letty |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.