Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Lucia Regalado, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Fernando G. Mancias presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFernando G. Mancias Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2021 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Order on Writ of Habeas Corpus, Signed
Date: March 30, 2021Proposed Order
Date: March 22, 2021Writ Issued
Date: March 22, 2021Notice Sent
Date: March 22, 2021Notice Sent
Date: March 31, 2021Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: March 22, 2021Notice Sent to HCSO
Date: March 30, 2021Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: March 22, 2021Order of Release, Signed
Date: March 29, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: March 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Cost Waived HABEAS CORPUS HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SEEKING BAIL REDUCTION ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SEEKING BAIL REDUCTION Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Writ of Habeas Corpus, Signed
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent to HCSO ORDER OF RELEASE ORDER OF RELEASE Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Release, Signed
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Called HELD. Appearing were Atty. Lucia Regalaco and her client from jail. Defendant is chaged with Evading arrest with detention. Bond set at $1000 cash/surety. HELD. Appearing were Atty. Lucia Regalaco and her client from jail. Defendant is chaged with Evading arrest with detention. Bond set at $1000 cash/surety. Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Habeas Corpus (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Mancias, Fernando G)
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ORDER ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ Issued Writ Issued Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER FOR A SETTING ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SEEKING BAIL REDUCTION ORDER FOR A SETTING ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SEEKING BAIL REDUCTION Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.