Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Weingarten Realty Investors, filed a(n) All Other Civil Cases (Oca) case represented by Rick A. Zuniga, against Garza, Jennifer J., Hausenfluck, Brandon, Rio Valley Interests, Llc D B A Venture X, represented by Michael A. Mcgurk, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 18, 2021 |
CategoryAll Other Civil Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice Signed |
Court Costs Paid
Date: February 09, 2022Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, Signed
Date: February 02, 2022Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: May 12, 2021Defendant's Original Answer
Date: April 12, 2021Citation Issued
Date: March 19, 2021Original Petition (OCA)
Date: March 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Costs Paid PARTY INCURRED PARTY INCURRED Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, Signed AGREED AGREED Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Entries AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE SIGNED;JRR AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE SIGNED;JRR Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery
Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer
Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation Issued Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Rio Valley Interests, LLC d/b/a Venture X Unserved Hausenfluck, Brandon Unserved Garza, Jennifer J. Unserved
Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.