Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Texas Department Of Family And Protective Services, filed a(n) Child Protection - Family case against Milstead, Tara Dawn, Milstead, James Edward, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 2021 |
CategoryChild Protective Services |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Protection |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney Fee Voucher | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Scheduling Order | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Discovery Control Plan Order | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Hearing Order | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Return Mail Envelope | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Report to the Court | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Paternity Registry Search | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Report | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Precept Returned Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.