Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case against Walden, Matthew David, represented by Cathy Compton, in the jurisdiction of Guadalupe County, TX, . Guadalupe County, TX Superior Courts with Crawford, Jessica presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCrawford, Jessica Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryWrit Of Habeas Corpus - Bond Reduction |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGuadalupe County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Capias
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Surety to Surrender
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Memorandum
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Crawford, Jessica)
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bond
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Unsigned Order
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application Filed (OCA)
Judge: Crawford, Jessica |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.