Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Richards, Cecilia, Richards, Mark, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brian Kennedy, against Agonza Enterprises, Llc, represented by Nicolas Del Campo, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 02, 2020 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Hearing CANCELED Entry of Judgment Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Kurita, M. Sue) Dismissed Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Non Suit Index # 32
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Index # 31
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status/DWOP (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Kurita, M. Sue) Result: Settled
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Index # 29
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Index # 30
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Index # 28
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Retain Index # 27
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status/DWOP (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Kurita, M. Sue) Result: Set for Status Hearing
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Index # 26
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.