Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Munoz, Maria T., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Alexandria Kellner Zant, against Estate Of Aaron Ramirez, represented by J L Jay, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Lizarraga, Marcos presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Order |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
|
April 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer Doc ID# 10
Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Friendly Suit (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Lizarraga, Marcos) 03/02/2016Reset by Court to 04/04/2016
Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Doc ID# 11
Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Report of Guardian Ad Litem (OCA) Doc ID# 12
Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Amended Plea and Intervention Doc ID# 9
Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
DC - Counter Petition/Cross Action/Counter Claim
Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 7
Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.