Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Katharine Banks, against Geiss, Nancy, represented by Whitney E Abbott, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Barill, Angie Juarez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarill, Angie Juarez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2012 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Call (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Barill, Angie Juarez)
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Pre-Trial Hearing (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officers Barill, Angie Juarez, Barill, Angie Juarez)
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Doc ID# 16
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judge's Conference CANCELED Judge's Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officers Barill, Angie Juarez, Barill, Angie Juarez) Settled Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 15
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 14
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dismiss Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Barill, Angie Juarez)
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Retain Doc ID# 13
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Doc ID# 11
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.