Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Scs Finance Ii, filed a(n) Property Appraisal Appeal case represented by John Brusniak, Jr., against El Paso Central Appraisal District, represented by Joseph T Longoria, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: EL PASO CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT, Disposition: FINAL JUDGMENT - NON JURY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: EL PASO CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT, Disposition: FINAL JUDGMENT - NON JURY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2004 |
CategoryProperty Appraisal Appeal |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MARQUEZ, EDWARD S.) Result: RESET
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: EL PASO CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT, Disposition: FINAL JUDGMENT - NON JURY |
|
October 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: EL PASO CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT, Disposition: FINAL JUDGMENT - NON JURY |
|
October 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MARQUEZ, EDWARD S.) Result: RESET
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: EL PASO CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT, Disposition: FINAL JUDGMENT - NON JURY |
|
August 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: EL PASO CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT, Disposition: FINAL JUDGMENT - NON JURY |
|
August 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MARQUEZ, EDWARD S.) Result: RESET
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: EL PASO CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT, Disposition: FINAL JUDGMENT - NON JURY |
|
July 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: EL PASO CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT, Disposition: FINAL JUDGMENT - NON JURY |
|
June 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MARQUEZ, EDWARD S.) Result: RESET
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: EL PASO CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT, Disposition: FINAL JUDGMENT - NON JURY |
|
March 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: EL PASO CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT, Disposition: FINAL JUDGMENT - NON JURY |
|
March 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MARQUEZ, EDWARD S.) Result: RESET
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: EL PASO CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT, Disposition: FINAL JUDGMENT - NON JURY |
|
January 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: EL PASO CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT, Disposition: FINAL JUDGMENT - NON JURY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.