Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case against Unknown Heirs Of Estate Of Gabino Aragon, Aragon, Gabino, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ESTATE OF GABINO ARAGON, Disposition: JUDGMENT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVilla, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ESTATE OF GABINO ARAGON, Disposition: JUDGMENT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2001 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2004 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ESTATE OF GABINO ARAGON, Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
September 24, 2004 | Docket Event |
ORSR
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ESTATE OF GABINO ARAGON, Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
May 25, 2004 | Docket Event |
Order for Attorney Ad Litem Fees
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ESTATE OF GABINO ARAGON, Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
May 25, 2004 | Docket Event |
Statement of Evidence
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ESTATE OF GABINO ARAGON, Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
May 24, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Villa, Carlos) 05/17/2004Continued to 05/24/2004 - Conflict - ARAGON, GABINO Result: Heard
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ESTATE OF GABINO ARAGON, Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
March 15, 2004 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ESTATE OF GABINO ARAGON, Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
March 15, 2004 | Docket Event |
Motion for Appointment of Attorney Ad Litem
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ESTATE OF GABINO ARAGON, Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
March 15, 2004 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ESTATE OF GABINO ARAGON, Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
March 15, 2004 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Continuance
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ESTATE OF GABINO ARAGON, Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
March 12, 2004 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Villa, Carlos) Result: Continued
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ESTATE OF GABINO ARAGON, Disposition: JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.