Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Carrizales, Gerardo, Martinez, Simon, Villanueva, Jorge, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mathis, Austin R., against Compliance Services Llc, Frie, Joe Theodore, represented by Mayer, Zach T., in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 358th District Court with Shrode, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShrode, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident > $250K |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House358th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Scheduling Conference | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING SET FOR: 07/14/2023 AT 9:30 AM |
|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING RECORDS AFFIDAVIT | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ORAL AND VIDEO DEPOSITION OF THE CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF COMPLIANCE SERVICES LLC |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
RULE 203 CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION (INDIRECT COURT COSTS) $263.00 CHARGED FOR DEPO RECORDS FROM: FRED LOYA INSURANCE |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
RULE 203 CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION (INDIRECT COURT COSTS) DEPOSITION-UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER-LUBBOCK- MEDICAL RECORDS |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
RULE 203 CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION (INDIRECT COURT COSTS) UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER-LUBBOCK- RADIOLOGY |
|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
RULE 203 CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION (INDIRECT COURT COSTS) $279.06 CHARGED FOR DEPO FROM MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITAL-MEDICAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.