Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Meza, Marlin, represented by Sarabia, Daniel, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 161st District Court with Low, Justin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLow, Justin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House161st District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note Defendant will do 3 days in Ector County Jail as a condition of probation beginning on Tuesday, November 30, 2021 until Thursday, December 2, 2021, followed by ISP. Justin W. Low |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing ADMINISTRATIVE HEARING |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Payment of Court Appointed Attorney $800 PAYABLE TO D. SARABIA. EMAILED TO AUDITOR & D. SARABIA ON 8/30/21 BY D.L. |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DEFERRED ADJUDICATION; PLACEMENT ON COMMUNITY SUPERVIS | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS (Plea) | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | TRIAL COURT'S CERTIFICATE | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR COMMUNITY SUPERVISION | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | WRITTEN ADMONISHMENT - INELIGIBLE TO POSSESS FIREARM/AMMO | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFERRED JUDGMENT & PROBATION EMAILED TO D. SARABIA ON 08/16/2021 BY HR |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF DISCOVERY (Plea) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.