Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fu, Jyue Hwa, filed a(n) Property case represented by Bal, Sartaj, against Ling, David, Ling'S Holding, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 68th District Court with HOFFMAN, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHOFFMAN, MARTIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryProperty |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House68th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 26, 2021NOTE - CLERKS
Date: September 20, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
MAILED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT TO DAVID LING NOTE - CLERKS MAILED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT TO PARTIES |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FWD NONSUIT TO JUDGE'S QUEUE |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF NON-SUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOITCE OF NON-SUIT NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION LING'S HOLDING, LLC |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION DAVID LING |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SERVICE | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
ISSUE CITATION - 2. LING S HOLDING, LLC ISSUE CITATION |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.