Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Soliz, Elizabeth, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Daspit, John Arthur, Du, Thompson, Klemm, David A., Lara, Jeremy R., Maurer, Nathan, (total of 7) See All against Simpson Property Group, L.P., represented by Livermore, Meredith P, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 68th District Court with HOFFMAN, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHOFFMAN, MARTIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House68th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 26, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 26, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: July 27, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 06, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 06, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 06, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 06, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 03, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 19, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 06, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: August 04, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 12, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: March 26, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: May 03, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 31, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: July 13, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 24, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 09, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 07, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 07, 2021RULE 11
Date: July 15, 2021DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: July 15, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 01, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: September 10, 2021ORDER - PROTECT
Date: December 15, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 09, 2021DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: September 07, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 10, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 18, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 18, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 18, 2021DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: November 16, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: November 16, 2021DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: November 09, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: February 03, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 01, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 03, 2022DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: December 30, 2021MOTION - PROTECT
Date: December 09, 2021Scheduling Conference
Date: February 07, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 01, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 23, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 23, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 06, 2021NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: October 31, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: March 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 17, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 02, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 26, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: February 07, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 26, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
68th Court-Cover Pg for Level 1/2 Sch Order or Med Order Jury Trial - Civil 1ST TRL SETTING - ASSIGNED A MEDIATOR AND MLD NTCS TO ALL PARTIES |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF AGREED JUDGMENT MAILED NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FWD SIGNED TAKE NOTHING JUDGMNT TO CLERKS |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FWD AGREED TAKE NOTHING JUDGMENT TO JUDGE FOR REV |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER AGREED TAKE NOTHING JUDGMENT CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER AGREED TAKE NOTHING JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER AGREED TAKE NOTHING JUDGMENT |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
68th COVER SHEET - hearing notice form Scheduling Conference **WAITING ON SCHEDULING ORDER**MLD NTCS TO ALL PARTIES |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER LEVEL 3 |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER REGARDING SCHEDULING ORDER CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE REGARDING SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER LEVEL 3 NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT SCHEDULING ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.