Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Stanfield, Jolaundra, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Eldridge, V. Paige, against Bacon Plumbing Inc., Leyva, Luke Gabriel, represented by Kenefick, John S, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 191st District Court with SLAUGHTER, GENA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSLAUGHTER, GENA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House191st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 25, 2021ORDER - PRETRIAL
Date: May 18, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 29, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 15, 2021MOTION - DISMISS
Date: June 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 14, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: March 25, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: March 25, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 11, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 11, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: October 24, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
191st COVER SHEET Jury Trial - Civil |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS COPY TO PLT AND DEF |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRETRIAL | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLT NOTICE OF SERVICE AND FILING AFFS AFFIDAVIT |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION:BACON PLUMBING INC. RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED CITATION:BACON PLUMBING INC |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION:LUKE GABRIEL LEYVA RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT ORIGINAL ANSWER-LUKE LEYVA AND BACON PLUMBING INC ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION LUKE GABRIEL LEYVA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.