Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bcd Company, Reichert Family Partnership & Don And Bettie Reichert, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Wilson, Chad T., against Covington Specialty Insurance Company, represented by Raborn, John M, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 14th District Court with MOYE', ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOYE', ERIC Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House14th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 20, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: March 25, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 03, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: March 25, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 04, 2021NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT
Date: May 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | TRIAL SETTING (JURY) | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TRIAL AND LVL 1 S/O MAILED |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER LEVEL 1 |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
SECY/STATE - COVINGTON SPECIALTY COMPANY RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORIG ANS - COVINGTON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION:COVINGTON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION COVINGTON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION- COVINGTON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ISSUE CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.