Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Jennifer Tharp, against Bruzon, Jose Geraldo Chaples, Ochoa Hernandez, J Santos, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CITATION RETURNED SERVED | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | CITATION | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation Bruzon, Jose Geraldo Chaples Served 05/18/2023 Response Due 06/12/2023 Returned 05/22/2023 | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PROCESS | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | CITATION RETURNED UNSERVED | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CITATION | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation Bruzon, Jose Geraldo Chaples Returned Unserved 05/12/2023 Returned 05/12/2023 | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PROCESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.