Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Breakell, Kristi Lynnette filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Matzke, Amanda presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatzke, Amanda Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryLetters Of Testamentary |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Affdt. in Lieu of Inv. Appraisement & List of Claims (OCA) | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | OATH | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Testamentary | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | MISCELLANEOUS REPORT | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Death and Other Facts | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation - Returned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.