Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Garcia, John, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Candice Garcia-Rodrigo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 17, 2023 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a petition to suspend and remove trustee Christine Smith and appoint a successor trustee for the Shirley A. Garcia Trust. The complaint alleges that Shirley A. Garcia executed the Declaration of Trust on August 29, 2021, and passed ...
Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted
Date: March 20, 2023Initial Trust Petition Filed
Date: March 17, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: March 17, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): P. 1 NEEDS TO INCLUDE DATE WITH SIGNATURE AND P. 2 NEEDS TO INCLUDE NAME |
|
May 09, 2023 |
Department S37 - SBJC
Judge: Garcia-Rodrigo, Candice |
||
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition Dismissed without prejudice |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Initial Trust Petition Filed PETITION TO SUSPEND AND REMOVE TRUSTEE AND APPOINT SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE |
|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Assignment Received | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.