Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Sila, Karen L, Sila, Robert L, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case against Voesten, Darlynn S., in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Mann, Douglas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2022 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service
Date: February 01, 2024Notice of Case Assignment
Date: December 19, 2023Initial Trust Petition Filed
Date: October 05, 2022Petition/Order for Appointment of Successor Trustee Filed
Date: December 15, 2023Citation Issued
Date: December 15, 2023Proof of Service
Date: February 01, 2024Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: October 24, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: January 18, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 20, 2024Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2024 |
Department F2 - Fontana
Judge: Garcia-Rodrigo, Candice |
||
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: reassignment |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service OF CITATION AND PETITION TO COMPEL TRUSTEE ON 1.2.24 AS TO ROBERT L SILA |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service CITATION AND PETITION TO COMPEL TRUSTEE BY NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT ON 1.29.24 AS TO KAREN SILA |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment | |
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition/Order for Appointment of Successor Trustee Filed PETITION TO COMPEL TRUSTEE TO ACCOUNT, DISTRIBUTE THE TRUST RES AND BREACH OF FUDICIARY DUTY |
|
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation Issued | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy Purchased ORDER |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: DETERMINING PETITION TO CONFIRM... |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Signed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.