Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cortez Iii, Joy J, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Douglas K Mann presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 18, 2022 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice Filed
Date: August 18, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 18, 2022Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: January 18, 2023Proof of Service
Date: January 18, 2023Accounting Report Filed
Date: December 30, 2022Initial Trust Petition Filed
Date: July 18, 2022Objection Filed
Date: November 18, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: August 25, 2022Inventory & Appraisal Filed
Date: February 08, 2023Mediation Notice Filed
Date: April 19, 2023Notice Filed
Date: March 15, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 13, 2023Surety Bond Filed
Date: October 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2023 |
Department F2 - Fontana
Judge: Mann, Douglas K |
||
September 27, 2023 | Department S34 - SBJC | ||
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed NOTICE OF SCHEDULING COURT SPONSORED MEDIATION |
|
August 07, 2023 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Mann, Douglas K |
||
July 19, 2023 | Department S34 - SBJC | ||
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Mediation not held. Mediation off Calendar. Death in Family ; counsel to coordinate continued mediation. |
|
June 21, 2023 | Department S34 - SBJC | ||
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Mediation Notice Filed Continued to 07/19/2023 |
|
April 19, 2023 | Department S34 - SBJC | ||
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Mediation held. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.