Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Public Guardian, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michelle H. Gilleece presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Inventory & Appraisal Filed
Date: April 25, 2019Inventory & Appraisal Filed
Date: April 09, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: November 27, 2018Notice of Filing of Inventory/ Appraisal and How to Object
Date: June 04, 2020Inventory & Appraisal Filed
Date: April 30, 2019Accounting Report Filed
Date: April 13, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: April 20, 2021Order Approving Accounting Filed
Date: July 26, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: May 21, 2019Petition Filed
Date: November 06, 2018Notice of Filing of Inventory/ Appraisal and How to Object
Date: April 16, 2019Petition (Probate) Filed
Date: May 16, 2019Notice of Filing of Inventory/ Appraisal and How to Object
Date: May 09, 2019Inventory & Appraisal Filed
Date: February 03, 2020Accounting Not Filed-Hearing Set
Date: March 06, 2023Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: June 25, 2019Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: November 23, 2020Stipulation & Order re: Appointment of Judge Pro Tem filed
Date: December 03, 2018Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: July 02, 2019Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: November 17, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: December 03, 2018Order Filed Re:
Date: July 08, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: December 03, 2018Receipt Filed
Date: June 09, 2020Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: July 07, 2020Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: November 28, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 08, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2023 |
Department S36 - SBJC
Judge: Gilleece, Michelle |
||
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Accounting Not Filed-Hearing Set | |
September 13, 2021 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY | |
September 13, 2021 | Hearing | Accounting Review Original Type Accounting Review Hearing Time 10:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Accounting Filed SETTLING FIRST ACCOUNT AND REPORT |
|
July 26, 2021 | Hearing | Order Signed | |
July 26, 2021 | Hearing | Accounting Approved | |
July 26, 2021 | Hearing | Order Approving Accounting Filed View Document Order Approving Accounting Filed Comment SETTLING FIRST ACCOUNT AND REPORT | |
July 26, 2021 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment FIRST ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF PUBLIC GUARDIAN AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.